PENRITH PLAYERS THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur theatre company promoting music, drama and related activities for adults and young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 22 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER ANDREW BIRD | Chair |
|
||||||
Jonathan Rostron | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Mikaela Binder | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CATHRINE ROSTRON | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Matthew James Collingwood | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mary Hodson | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jayne Johnson | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN DAVID BAKER | Trustee | 20 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PAUL HARGREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.70k | £23.14k | £31.43k | £57.92k | £59.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.58k | £34.46k | £33.94k | £53.25k | £45.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.36k | £21.39k | £2.89k | £7.77k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE,MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS,INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA,MIME,DANCING,SINGING AND MUSIC,LITERATURE AND POETRY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE PENRITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PLAYHOUSE
AUCTION MART LANE
PENRITH
CUMBRIA
CA11 7JG
- Phone:
- 01768361895
- Email:
- penrithplayers@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window