STUDIO 3 ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Studio 3 Arts promotes and delivers quality arts to empower local communities and address today's social issues. Working primarily in the London Boroughs of Barking & Dagenham, Havering, Redbridge and Waltham Forest, Studio 3 Arts tailor-makes arts activity for all the community in partnership with key local, regional and national organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income:
£2,176,907
Donations and legacies | £2.18m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £39 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,038,010
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.04m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £36,564 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.04m | |
Retained for future use | £1.14m |
People

8 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Redbridge
- Thurrock
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 23 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN WEST-WHYLIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ellen Doran | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Anna Baker | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Cox | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Caroline Rokeya Sylvia Nicola Meaby | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Sarah Murray | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Francis McDonagh | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £690.68k | £708.15k | £708.83k | £1.14m | £2.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £609.81k | £603.25k | £694.86k | £744.91k | £1.04m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £164.00k | £99.00k | £180.17k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.00k | £30.00k | £459.40k | £543.00k | £36.56k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £602.79k | £564.15k | £488.18k | £1.11m | £2.18m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £35 | £274 | £140 | £150 | £39 | |
|
Income - Other | £87.86k | £143.72k | £220.65k | £27.64k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £498.12k | £603.25k | £694.86k | £744.91k | £1.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £102.52k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £10.86k | £0 | £0 | £8.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £9.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £51.43k | £48.62k | £122.41k | £195.56k | £1.90m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £245.03k | £348.98k | £452.94k | £691.33k | £460.97k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £154.44k | £161.56k | £325.18k | £239.72k | £575.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PERSONS BELOW THE AGE OF 25 THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THE DRAMATIC ARTS. (2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
STUDIO 3 ARTS
Galleon Centre
Boundary Road
BARKING
IG11 7J
- Phone:
- 02085947136
- Email:
- hello@studio3arts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window