THE IPSWICH DISABLED ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide free and confidential information & advice to people with disabilities, their families and carers, provide information to organisations & agencies serving people with disabilities, work for improved statutory services, educate public opinion, and undertake research. We cover the Ipswich area and south-east Suffolk from the coast almost to Sudbury an including the Hadleigh area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £47,250 from 2 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Francis John | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simone Butler Mayer | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.09k | £67.75k | £141.33k | £87.45k | £96.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.15k | £104.19k | £108.25k | £116.04k | £97.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.14k | £47.25k | £47.25k | £54.75k | £47.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 May 2021 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
18 May 2021 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 AUGUST 2009.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS LIVING IN IPSWICH AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AND TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF A DIRECT INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE AND THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO METHODS OF RELIEVING THEIR DISABILITY AND PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 TOWER STREET
IPSWICH
IP1 3BE
- Phone:
- 01473 217313
- Email:
- bureau@ipswichdab.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window