DRAYTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity Number: 1054822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £690
Total expenditure: £2,108

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 April 1996: Standard registration
  • 03 October 2013: Funds received from 215702 ELIZABETH (WIDOW OF JOHN) WETENHALL CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Catherine Sarah McBride Chair 05 December 2017
SIR ROWLAND HILL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, DRAYTON IN HALES
Received: On time
THE COLLEY SALTER CHRISTMAS FUND
Received: On time
MARKET DRAYTON FOODBANK
Received: On time
Mark Joseph Whittle Trustee 02 March 2019
None on record
Professor Charles Lindsay Bashford Trustee 08 December 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, DRAYTON IN HALES
Received: On time
SIR ROWLAND HILL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE COLLEY SALTER CHRISTMAS FUND
Received: On time
FOUNTAINS COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
Val Creasey Trustee 27 November 2013
THE COLLEY SALTER CHRISTMAS FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £944 £957 £670 £688 £690
Total expenditure £570 £353 £595 £1.15k £2.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 THE MOUNT
MOUNT LANE
MARKET DRAYTON
TF9 1AG
Phone:
01630652656
Website:

No information available