Financial history GRIMSBY, CLEETHORPES AND DISTRICT DIAL-A-RIDE

Charity number: 1054823
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £165.29k £150.74k £97.73k £97.73k £93.79k
Total expenditure £197.89k £134.67k £143.48k £143.48k £133.64k
Income from government contracts £102.93k £99.69k £49.18k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.58k £10.18k £75.07k N/A