Accounts and annual returns ST BARNABAS OXFORD CHURCH RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity Number: 1054826
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 08 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 05 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required