Trustees CALLINGTON AMATEUR DRAMA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1054831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kelvin Leighton-Julian Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Chris Ley Trustee 07 August 2024
PILLATON VILLAGE HALL CIO
Received: On time
TAMAR ARTS AND DRAMA ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
Theresa Wilcox Trustee 15 March 2024
TAMAR ARTS AND DRAMA ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
Allana Frances Hansell Trustee 06 December 2023
TAMAR ARTS AND DRAMA ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
Julie Dawn Baldwin Trustee 09 March 2023
TAMAR ARTS AND DRAMA ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
Pauline Thomas Trustee 01 March 2020
TAMAR ARTS AND DRAMA ASSOCIATION
Recently registered