CYLCH MEITHRIN DYFFRYN ARDUDWY A THALYBONT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN CYLCH MEITHRIN DYFFRYN ARDUDWY A THALYBONT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,080 from 2 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 23 April 1996: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 February 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ffion Meleri Thomas | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sian Ephraim Williams | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gwenfair Wyn Williams | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.98k | £22.87k | £34.74k | £38.07k | £36.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.60k | £24.62k | £26.15k | £36.41k | £42.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.41k | £9.07k | £25.00k | £26.39k | £25.08k | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | £700 | £2.40k | £5.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 September 2024 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 September 2024 | 220 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CYFANSODDIAD Y CYLCH YN AMGAEEDIG DERBYNIWYD GAN Y PWYLLGOR AR 13 SEPTEMBER 1995 - CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
AMCANION Y GYMDEITHAS YW HYRWYDDO ADDYSG PLANT DAN OED YSGOL YN CYLCH MEITHRIN DYFFRYN ARDUDWY A THALYBONT TRWY GYFRWNG YR IAITH GYMREAG - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN CYLCH MEITHRIN DYFFRYN ARDUDWY A THALYBONT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE.
Area of benefit
DYFFRYN ARDUDWY A THALYBONT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bwth Meirion
Llanaber
Barmouth
LL42 1RR
- Phone:
- 07810376362
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window