THE JOHN ABBOTT'S TRUSTEES LADIES' HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES HOUSING FOR ELDERLEY LADIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
Governance
- 03 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD NORMAN WOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Debbie Gallimore | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Crowther | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER HORSFALL BENSON | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ANNE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.00k | £151.09k | £95.51k | £109.32k | £145.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.42k | £177.87k | £81.98k | £105.01k | £169.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 13 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR WOMEN AGED 50 YEARS OR OVER WHO ARE NOT MARRIED AND ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED AS A RESULT OF BEING REDUCED IN CIRCUMSTANCES. PREFERENCE WILL BE GIVEN TO WOMEN SO QUALIFIED WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE PARISH OF HALIFAX AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 11 JULY 1886.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Finn Gledhill & Co
1-3 Harrison Road
HALIFAX
HX1 2AG
- Phone:
- 01422330000
- Email:
- marc@finngledhill.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window