Financial history THE ARBITER MUSIC TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1054904
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2004 30/04/2005 30/04/2006 30/04/2007 30/04/2008
Total gross income £500 £1.16k £2.16k £746 £441
Total expenditure £1.25k £1.78k £4.88k £33.79k £9.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A