THE CHARITY FINANCE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity Finance Group aims to provide information, training, conferences and networking opportunities to finance professionals in the voluntary sector. To lobby and campaign and promote best practice on behalf of finance professionals in the sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,822,887
Donations and legacies | £127.64k | |
Charitable activities | £1.56m | |
Other trading activities | £109.92k | |
Investments | £15.48k | |
Other | £13.66k |
Total expenditure:
£1,723,311
Raising funds | £108.42k | |
Charitable activities | £1.61m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £108.42k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.61m | |
Retained for future use | £99.58k |
People

18 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 April 1996: Standard registration
- C F D G (Working name)
- THE CHARITY FINANCE DIRECTORS' GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Wells | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Bennett | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Hugh Wallace | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Nicholls | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Linton | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Ryder | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
MWIZAKUNYUMA MKANDAWIRE | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Michael O'Brien | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68m | £1.24m | £1.28m | £1.51m | £1.82m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.88m | £1.40m | £1.36m | £1.52m | £1.72m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £70.42k | £75.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £28.83k | £108.92k | £100.86k | £98.56k | £127.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £118.21k | £37.15k | £3.00k | £132.01k | £109.92k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.53m | £1.03m | £1.06m | £1.27m | £1.56m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.23k | £379 | £148 | £6.88k | £15.48k | |
|
Income - Other | £149 | £67.84k | £116.36k | £6.05k | £13.66k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.80m | £1.35m | £1.34m | £1.48m | £1.61m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £82.29k | £47.03k | £28.39k | £37.26k | £108.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £10.98k | £18.33k | £57.05k | £34.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £120.61k | £61.17k | £3.95k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.44m | £1.11m | £1.40m | £1.40m | £1.56m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.04m | £814.22k | £1.13m | £1.13m | £1.19m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 2017 as amended on 31 Mar 2022 as amended on 28 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE GROUP'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO: 2.1 ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATIONS; 2.2 PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS (INCLUDING FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT) OF PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATIONS AND IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH TO IDENTIFY NEEDS AND ESTABLISHING PROJECTS OR POLICIES TO ADDRESS THOSE NEEDS; (B) PROVIDING TRAINING, CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS; (C) BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF (INCLUDING THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES) AND ENABLING THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND BEST PRACTICE AMONGST FINANCE ADVISERS AND PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATIONS; (D) THE PROVISION OF A PRO-ACTIVE AND ACCESSIBLE SERVICE OFFERING PRACTICAL HELP, ADVICE AND SUPPORT; (E) ACTING AS A REPRESENTATIVE AND INTERMEDIARY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATIONS, INCLUDING IN RELATION TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHER AGENCIES AND BODIES; (F) PROVIDING INFORMATION TO THE PRESS AND THE PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF THE OPERATION OF OR PROBLEMS ENCOUNTERED BY PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATIONS.? ("PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATIONS" MEANS CHARITIES (INCLUDING THEIR WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES), VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, CO-OPERATIVES, MUTUALS AND OTHER FORMS OF SOCIAL ENTERPRISES ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC AND COMMUNITY BENEFIT).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canopi
82 Tanner Street
LONDON
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 07584609400
- Email:
- mail@cfg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window