WEST TOWN MUSLIM SOCIAL AND WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND TEACHING OF MOTHER TONGUE 2) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 29 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Hanif | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Islam Khan | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Khan | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abid Ishaq | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.19k | £92.62k | £92.32k | £115.64k | £128.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.84k | £97.90k | £78.75k | £108.10k | £110.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1996 AND 2 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND TEACHING OF MOTHER TONGUE 3) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION
Area of benefit
WEST TOWN DEWSBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Markazi Mosque
3 High Street
Westtown
DEWSBURY
West Yorkshire
WF13 2PU
- Phone:
- 07595429919
- Email:
- abidishaq@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window