CENTRAL MOSQUE ROCHDALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO BUILD, OWN AND OPERATE A MOSQUE IN ROCHDALE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rochdale
Governance
- 30 April 1996: Standard registration
- NEW IDARA TALEEM-UL-ISLAM LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YASIR PATEL | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Azhar Zouq | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Mohammad Arshad | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Mohammad Ahsan Ul Haq | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Anwar | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
HAFIZ ABDULMALIK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZAFAR IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.00k | £277.40k | £271.39k | £384.17k | £478.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.40k | £238.31k | £235.88k | £283.46k | £383.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/02/2005
Charitable objects
1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH.2)TO PROVIDE,IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE,FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND COMMUNITY,SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
ROCHDALE,GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
CASTLEMERE COMMUNITY CENTRE
TWEEDALE STREET
ROCHDALE
OL11 1HH
- Phone:
- 01706645200
- Email:
- MALIK@CASTLEMERE.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window