Accounts and annual returns THE DURHAM MEDIEVAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1055003
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 November 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 11 November 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 11 November 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 11 November 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 11 November 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2005 Not submitted