Governing document THE BRIDGE PROJECT (BRIDGING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE COMMUNITY)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 MARCH 1996 AND 13 FEBRUARY 1997 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/06/03. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST AND SUPPORT IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THOSE PEOPLE IN THE WHOLE OF MERSEYSIDE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH PROVISION.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.