Accounts and annual returns NORTH YORKSHIRE AND YORK HOUSING ADVICE RESOURCE PROJECT

Charity number: 1055013
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 09 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 12 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 09 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 09 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 19 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 19 August 2004 On Time