THE VILLAGE HALL OF KIRKBY OVERBLOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Building a village hall and/or a village venue
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 May 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR G H NUTTALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeremy David Cross | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||
David Nield Yeadon | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|||||
ROBERT FREDERICK HENDERSON | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Marcus Bennett | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | 30/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £461 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF KIRKBY OVERBLOW AND KEARBY WITH NETHERBY.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF KIRKBY OVERBLOW AND KEARBY WITH NETHERBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cleveland House
Barrowby Lane
Kirkby Overblow
HARROGATE
HG3 1HQ
- Phone:
- 01423872596
- Email:
- pross.ko@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window