THE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATIONS OF WALES
Charity Number: 1055032
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 01 May 1996: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- PTA WALES (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED 27 JANUARY 1996 AND 22 JUNE 1997.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN WALES BY ENCOURAGING THE FULLEST CO-OPERATION BETWEEN HOME AND SCHOOL, EDUCATION AUTHORITIES, THE WELSH OFFICE AND ALL INTERESTED PERSONS AND BODIES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WALES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window