NORTHUMBRIA POLICE CHARITIES FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund aims to provide assistance for vulnerable,disabled, disadvantaged or deprived groups of people or individuals within the Northumbria Police area as well as supporting community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 01 May 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Thomas Farish | Chair | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Thubron | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Ross | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Davis | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Turnbull de Santana | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Lambert | Trustee | 09 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £664 | £16.18k | £173 | £16.59k | £11.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.50k | £5.59k | £4.03k | £8.32k | £10.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE NORTHUMBRIA POLICE FORCE AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AS THE COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE NORTHUMBRIA POLICE FORCE AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northumbria Police
Newcastle City Centre Police Statio
Forth Banks Police Station
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 3PH
- Phone:
- 07885205936
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window