ACIL NAVSARJAN RURAL DEVELOPMENT CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
- Kenya
Governance
- 30 April 1996: Standard registration
- 22 September 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ACIL (Working name)
- ANARDE (Working name)
- ANARDE FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6.00k | £11.21k | £11.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5 | £17.41k | £17.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEROF UPON TRUST EITHER TO APPLY THE SAME (BOTH AS TO CAPITAL AND INCOME) FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK THINK FIT .
Area of benefit
INDIA, KENYA, ZAMBIA, NIGERIA, THAILAND, AND BANGLADESH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window