Accounts and annual returns KINGS LYNN VANCOUVER ROUND TABLE 1114

Charity Number: 1055082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 March 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 March 2021 55 days late Download Open in new window