Governing document DOWNS SYNDROME DIAMOND FOUNDATION LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19TH APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 APR 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE OF INDIVIDUALS WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME, AND 3.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON ACCOUNT OF THEM HAVING DOWN'S SYNDROME OR THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.