CRICH CARR AND WHATSTANDWELL COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of financial and other support to the village school (Crich Carr CE Primary School) and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 02 May 1996: Standard registration
- 19 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £685 | £516 | £732 | £400 | £383 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £500 | £0 | £5.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 09 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 21 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 24 July 2015 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/03/1996 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
INHABITANTS OF CRICH CARR AND WHATSTANDWELL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window