Friends of Ascot Heath Primary School

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a parents association who seek to raise money for our school so we get as many of the items requested by the school to make it the best place to be for our children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 02 May 1996: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 October 2009: Standard registration
- 08 June 2021: Funds received from 1031750 ASCOT HEATH JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION
- ASCOT HEATH COUNTY INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vicky Garbett | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Harvey | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennefer Kensey | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Barnett | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.02k | £8.79k | £5.93k | £16.06k | £18.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00k | £5.52k | £12.72k | £2.97k | £5.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 12 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JANUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 14 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAY 2017 as amended on 08 Jul 2019 as amended on 02 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ascot Heath Primary School
Rhododendron Walk
ASCOT
Berkshire
SL5 8PN
- Phone:
- 01344 882631
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window