BROMLEY SOMALI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Learning & educational programme - Supplementary schools and Homework Support Club Domiciliary care service Developing and supporting mentors and role models for young people. Welfare advice, information and support service for older people and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 May 1996: Standard registration
- BSCA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdullahi Hagi Mohamed | Chair | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Billal ABDI | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Abdurahman Ali Mohamed | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ali Mohamed Addo | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £9.00k | £22.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £8.90k | £21.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 26TH APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE SOMALIS OR OF SOMALIAN DECENT BY EDUCATION AND BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED. (2) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS FROM SOMALIA AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE RESIDENT OR ARE INTENDING TO RESIDE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE REPRESENTATION, COUNSELING, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS ASYLUM, IMMIGRATION, MONEY, DEBTS WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
196 High Street
Penge
LONDON
SE20 7QB
- Phone:
- 02035834021
- Email:
- info@bromleysca.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window