THE RAPID TRAINING & EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide vocational training, guidance and advice to refugees and disadvantaged people mainly Tamil Refugees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 03 May 1996: Standard registration
- LONDON COLLEGE OF TECHNOLOGY (Working name)
- TR TEC (Working name)
- TAMIL REFUGEE TRAINING AND EDUCATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEBARAM AMIRTHANAYAGAM RAJAKARIAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ragunathan Nadarajah | Trustee | 20 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pavethira Sritharan | Trustee | 20 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sithar Sinniah Anantham | Trustee | 20 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Selvanayagam Selvanathan | Trustee | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthonipillai GA Fernando | Trustee | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ponnuthurai Vigneswaran | Trustee | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
RAGURAJ THAVARAJAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIYATHAMBY SELVADURAI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.02k | £12.00k | £11.50k | £13.80k | £12.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.88k | £9.36k | £16.43k | £10.10k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2023 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF TAMIL REFUGEES BY PROVIDING PROMOTING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICE FOR REFUGEES AND THEIR FAMILIES. (2) TO CARRY OUT AND COMMISSION STUDIES AND RESEARCH INTO THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND THE SPECIAL NEEDS OF REFUGEES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 HOMEFIELD AVENUE
ILFORD
IG2 7JG
- Phone:
- 02085974307
- Email:
- pavethira@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window