CENTRE FOR SEPARATED FAMILIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre for Separated Families provides a cohesive and strategic approach to meeting the needs of everyone who is affected by family separation. The emphasis of the work is upon the wellbeing of children affected by separation and improving their life experience and chances. We work nationally, using our research and evaluation, to help inform the debate and influence policy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 May 1996: Standard registration
- 18 December 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE CENTRE FOR SEPARATED FAMILIES (Working name)
- ONE PARENT FAMILIES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.71k | £539.71k | £228.33k | £90.21k | £117.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250.33k | £526.40k | £357.87k | £90.04k | £70.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 30 November 2012 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 30 November 2012 | 304 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 24 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 1996 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS (A) AND (B) DATED 3 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SEPARATED FAMILIES AND CHILDREN LIVING IN THEM, INCLUDING PARENTS CONSIDERING SEPARATION, PARENTS WITH CARE AND NON-RESIDENT PARENTS, GRAND-PARENTS AND OTHER EXTENDED FAMILY MEMBERS, FOSTER CARERS, PROSPECTIVE FOSTER CARERS, ADOPTIVE PARENTS AND PROSPECTIVE ADOPTIVE PARENTS CARING ALONE FOR CHILDREN AND CHILDREN THEMSELVES AT A NATIONAL LEVEL AND AS THE COMPANY SEES FIT IN THE CITY OF YORK AND IN THE SURROUNDING REGIONS OF YORKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
YORK AND SURROUNDING REGIONS OF NORTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window