THE MUSEUM OF DIVING AND UNDERWATER EXPLORATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities of a museum in association with the Historical Diving Society (registered charity no 1054184) It is intended that this charity will merge with the Historical Diving Society Limited (registered charity no. 1159032) at the beginning of 2015.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 May 1996: Standard registration
- 08 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1159032 THE HISTORICAL DIVING SOCIETY
- THE DIVING MUSEUM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.02k | £7.50k | £300 | £225 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £12.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 27 February 2016 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 01 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 02 February 2014 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 February 2013 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF DIVING AND UNDERWATER EXPLORATION BY ESTABLISHING A MUSEUM FOR PERMANENT EXHIBITION AND PRESERVATION OF ITEMS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window