QUAKER BOLIVIA LINK

Charity number: 1055192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Funding and supervising small community initiated projects aimed at improving the quality of life of impoverished, indigenous people in Bolivia, through community empowerment and the promotion of sustainable livelihoods. Principally with rural aymara communities in the Altiplano. Operates through sister organization in Bolivia 'Fundacion QBL' with a local board and development workers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £31,865
Total expenditure: £37,014

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolivia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD BLOOMFIELD Chair
None on record
Timothy Thompson Trustee 29 February 2020
None on record
MARTIN LLOYD Trustee 09 May 2015
None on record
DAVID MCHUGH Trustee 09 May 2015
THE DRS GREEN AND SLATER REST HOUSES
Received: 25 days late
SOCIETY OF FRIENDS - HARDSHAW ESTATES CHARITIES
Received: 65 days late
THE DRS GREEN AND SLATER REST HOUSES CIO
Received: 93 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26.01k £36.34k £47.69k £24.47k £31.87k
Total expenditure £21.52k £26.79k £49.43k £22.85k £37.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 November 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 November 2021 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 November 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 November 2020 21 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FRIENDS MEETING HOUSE
6 MOUNT STREET
MANCHESTER
M2 5NS
Phone:
01614452884
Email:
uk@qbl.org