Financial history MAIDSTONE AND TUNBRIDGE WELLS NHS CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1055215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £722.00k £542.00k £202.00k £158.00k £536.00k
Total expenditure £1.04m £325.00k £213.00k £367.00k £478.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £700.00k £522.00k N/A N/A £497.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £22.00k £20.00k N/A N/A £39.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £157.00k £0 N/A N/A £64.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £323.00k N/A N/A £478.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.00k £2.00k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £84.00k £86.00k N/A N/A £120.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.00k £2.00k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0