NORTH DEVON MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One to One Counselling, Therapeutic and Support Groups, Service User Representation, Mental Health Awareness Training, Representing the views and needs of those experiencing mental health issues to other agencies and the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £40,419 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 09 May 1996: Standard registration
- CLARITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard Antony Holman | Chair | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Harris | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Craigie | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Biederman | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher John McDonald | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryony McDonald | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.94k | £120.15k | £80.18k | £113.66k | £98.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.34k | £78.65k | £109.94k | £109.75k | £107.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £19.72k | £3.44k | £2.68k | £40.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2020
(These accounts |
07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUFFERING OF THOSE PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, AND TO IMPROVE THE CIRCUMSTANCES AND QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS THROUGH THE PROMOTION OR RESEARCH AND ADVICE IN SERVICE PROVISION AND INFORMATIO ON THE SUBJECT OF MENTAL HEALTH, THE RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE WIDELY DISSEMINATED AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH SUFFERING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
104A Boutport Street
BARNSTAPLE
EX31 1SY
- Phone:
- 01271267474
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window