Trustees NORTH DEVON MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS FORUM
Charity number: 1055224

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard Antony Holman | Chair | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Harris | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Craigie | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Biederman | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher John McDonald | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryony McDonald | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.