Financial history BRIGHTON HILL BASINGSTOKE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1055235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.10k £22.96k £32.75k £22.99k £28.77k
Total expenditure £12.20k £6.89k £11.34k £19.53k £32.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £17.37k £996 £1.80k