THE CANNOCK CHASE CHURCHES HOUSING COALITION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping to prevent homelessness by providing bridging loans, for rent advances and loss and damage guarantees, for people unable to provide such amounts upfront.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 May 1996: Standard registration
- 23 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1155364 STAFFORDSHIRE WOMEN'S AID
- 23 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1005975 COMBERTON MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
- 23 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1141285 PYE GREEN CHRISTIAN CENTRE
- 23 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1141285 PYE GREEN CHRISTIAN CENTRE
- CANNOCK CHASE CHURCHES HOUSING COALITION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.57k | £70 | £28.30k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £1.62k | £1.85k | £1.00k | £49.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.72k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMODATION FOR PERSONS LIVING IN THE CANNOCK CHASE OR SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN NEED. 2) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
CANNOCK CHASE DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window