Financial history Circus Leeds

Charity number: 1055291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.22k £390 £588 £46.60k £50.07k
Total expenditure £13.26k £1.54k £1.87k £39.66k £48.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.95k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A