HIGHER EDUCATION CAREERS SERVICES UNIT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HECSU's charitable object is "The advancement of education of applicants, students and graduates of any establishment of higher education which is a subscriber to or affiliate of HECSU by supporting and assisting the work of the careers advisory services, employers, academic staff and others"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 May 1996: Standard registration
- 19 March 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 March 2024: Funds transferred to 1149740 JISC
- HECSU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.75k | £154.18k | £3.60m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05m | £499.49k | £3.95m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £3.60m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £286 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £462.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £3.49m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £457 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JANUARY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 MAY 2017 as amended on 17 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF APPLICANTS TO, AND STUDENTS AND GRADUATES OF, ANY ESTABLISHMENT OF HIGHER EDUCATION BY SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING THE WORK OF CAREERS ADVISORY SERVICES, EMPLOYERS, ACADEMIC STAFF AND OTHERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window