PETERSFIELD SHOPMOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide an effective shopmobility scheme in Petersfield . To provide advice and assistance to the disabled in the usage of scooters and wheelchairs etc and to provide suitable equipment for hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 May 1996: Standard registration
- SOUTH DOWNS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- SOUTH DOWNS ASSOCIATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jan Peter Stuart | Chair | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Eveleigh | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Elaine Galvin | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.60k | £3.14k | £6.52k | £39.84k | £13.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69k | £3.84k | £4.65k | £26.47k | £9.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 MAR 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE FOR DISABLED PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH REDUCED MOBILITY LIVING IN, WORKING IN OR ASSOCIATED WITH THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS OF PETERSFIELD, LISS, HORNDEAN AND THE SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF MOBILITY SCOOTERS, WHEELCHAIRS AND OTHER FORMS OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
LISS, PETERSFIRLD, HORNDEAN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHOP MOBILITY SERVICE
PARK ROAD
PETERSFIELD
HAMPSHIRE
GU32 3DL
- Phone:
- 01730710474
- Email:
- manager@shopmobility.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window