Governing document THE MEETING PLACE - CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Charity Number: 1055311
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 13 MARCH 1996, 15 MAY 2007, 3 NOVEMBER 2009 AND 6 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
TO OFFER A SAFE, FRIENDLY AND NEUTRAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE AREA SERVED BY SCARBOROUGH BOROUGH COUNCIL AND RYEDALE DISTRICT COUNCIL, WHERE CHILDREN OF SEPARATED FAMILIES CAN SPEND TIME WITH ONE OR BOTH PARENTS AND SOMETIMES OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.