WOOD END SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the association is to advance the education of the children at the school through the improvement of their educational environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 May 1996: Standard registration
- Friends of Wood End (Working name)
- WOOD END SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kat Copsey | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Watkins | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Garrod | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vix Felgate | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Moore | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Fisher | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Frost | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.12k | £22.98k | £55.74k | £71.83k | £50.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.43k | £30.37k | £12.44k | £65.06k | £80.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 24TH SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
HARPENDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOOD END SCHOOL
YEOMANS AVENUE
HARPENDEN
AL5 3EF
- Phone:
- 01582761636
- Email:
- woodendpta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window