WILLOW TREE PLAYGROUP KINGSCLIFFE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Willow Tree Playgroup provides pre-school play and learning for local children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 14 May 1996: Standard registration
- 08 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KINGS CLIFFE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.44k | £47.64k | £60.76k | £47.11k | £27.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.52k | £44.92k | £47.24k | £49.98k | £68.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £28.32k | £44.23k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.83k | £4.00k | £3.53k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 10 October 2019 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 10 October 2019 | 102 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 27 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2017
(These accounts |
27 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 26 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
26 June 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY; (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF SUCH NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window