Accounts and annual returns COED CAE COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1055340
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 30 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 06 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 13 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 27 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 September 2006 On Time