RICHMOND SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1055389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising to benefit the pupils of the Richmond School, Skegness. Events include discos, June Day Jaunt, Christmas Fair, film nights, bingo and more.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £12,790
Total expenditure: £13,643

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kim Kirk Chair 01 September 2023
None on record
Gemma Jackson Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Lois Slocombe Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.11k £5.91k £14.83k £12.20k £12.79k
Total expenditure £11.35k £1.10k £12.37k £14.39k £13.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 September 2023 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 September 2021 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Richmond Primary Academy
Richmond Drive
SKEGNESS
Lincolnshire
PE25 3SH
Phone:
01754 766639