BEESTON GATEWAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth club activities for people with learning difficulties. Holidays and outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 May 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Kirkham | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES LOWE | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES JOSEPH SUMMERS | Trustee | 30 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDRENA WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB O'DONNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BARRY CARVIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN FLORENCE CARVIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
S I SUMMERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.98k | £3.27k | £3.14k | £5.84k | £7.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.51k | £2.66k | £4.03k | £6.67k | £7.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED 10 MAY 1996 AND 22 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION, IN THE LOCALITY, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF MENTAL HANDICAP WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 GRASSMERE GARDENS
GOTHAM
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 0JD
- Phone:
- 01159830472
- Email:
- sisummers@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window