THE PRINCESS MARY'S ROYAL AIR FORCE NURSING SERVICE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust exists to promote the efficiency of the Princess Mary's Royal Air Force Nursing Service in such ways as the Trustees see fit. It provides worldwide assistance and relief of hardship to serving and retired personnel and supports the development of RAF nursing and education through scholarships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 May 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Air Commodore Darren Ellison | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gp Capt rtd Barry Wroe | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gp Capt Charlotte Thompson | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sqn Ldr Michael Bailey | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sqn Ldr Melvyn Johnston | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Flight Sergeant Nina Suzanne Sanderson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
WO Kay Rebecca Ward | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GP CAPT J L GROSS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.77k | £5.63k | £5.19k | £6.64k | £17.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.98k | £10.37k | £12.00k | £12.01k | £22.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 13 APRIL 1993 AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18 NOVEMBER 1996 AND RESOLUTION DATED 17 JUNE 2010. AS AMENDED ON 13 APR 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE AND IN PARTICULAR PRINCESS MARY'S ROYAL AIR FORCE NURSING SERVICE (THE SERVICE) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE SERVICE, AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Health Directorate
Nimrod Block - 1st Floor
RAF High Wycombe
RAF High Wycombe
High Wycombe
HP14 4UE
- Phone:
- 02392286535
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window