AMBASSADORS FOOTBALL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ambassadors Football runs and facilitates football projects that build bridges across cultural, faith, ethnic and postcode divides, providing support, resources and training in order to invest in communities and empower volunteers, trainees, staff and churches to start new initiatives that lead to tangible social change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Cardiff
- Gloucestershire
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Nottinghamshire
- Sheffield City
- Shropshire
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 May 1996: Standard registration
- A I S (Working name)
- AMBASSADORS FC (Working name)
- AMBASSADORS IN SPORT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Edward Money | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Louise Wood | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Boyden | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Pearson | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ROLES | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|||||
MR MARK THOMAS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN ORTLIP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £329.02k | £292.42k | £282.74k | £307.52k | £345.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331.66k | £259.43k | £268.17k | £305.24k | £353.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £30.44k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ESPECIALLY IN AND THROUGH SPORT AND SPORTS CHAPLAINCY AND PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) INVOLVING YOUTH, CHURCH AND SCHOOL GROUPS IN SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ambassadors Football
Claremont House
St. Georges Road
BOLTON
BL1 2BY
- Phone:
- 01204364040
- Email:
- gb@ambassadorsfootball.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window