Accounts and annual returns THE MALCOLM SARGENT FESTIVAL CHOIR

Charity number: 1055426
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 May 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 October 2019 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 June 2018 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 23 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 23 January 2017 On Time