International Friends of the National Gallery of Ireland

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donation of funds for the specific acquisition of paintings of a particular origin and era for the National Gallery of Ireland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ireland
Governance
- 16 May 1996: Standard registration
- BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL GALLERY OF IRELAND (Previous name)
- THE BRITISH FUND FOR THE NATIONAL GALLERY OF IRELAND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Kennelly | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Campbell | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Marriott | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Stanley | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Gallagher | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Baxter | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zelda Cheatle | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Ahearne | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DAVIS | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.86k | £0 | £30.38k | £6.29k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.38k | £2.51k | £26.55k | £2.33k | £4.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 OCT 2016 as amended on 24 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATIONAL GALLERY OF IRELAND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATIONAL GALLERY OF IRELAND
MERRION SQUARE WEST
DUBLIN 2
IRELAND
- Phone:
- 0035316615133
- Email:
- noconnor@ngi.ie
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window