RAINHAM AND WENNINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social clubs for the elderly and women groups, karate club, dance classes and pre-school. Hall hire for social functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Havering
Governance
- 20 May 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REGINALD MICHAEL WARNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
charles lipman | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LILIAN ELIZABETH WARNER | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PAUL BARRETT | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.07k | £28.16k | £41.84k | £44.24k | £44.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.17k | £25.48k | £32.64k | £40.37k | £51.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF RANIHAM AND WENNINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF DEFINED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY WARD BOUNDRIES OF RAINHAM AND WENNINGTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
RAINHAM AND WENNINGTON AS DEFINED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORTY WARD BOUNDRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
344 UPMINSTER ROAD NORTH
RAINHAM
RM13 9RY
- Phone:
- 01708556599
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window