THIRSK AND SOWERBY TOWN HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the hall is to provide a place where residents of Thirsk & Sowerby can meet for cultural, recreational and charitable purposes. The Town Hall Management Committee are responsible for the day to day running of the building and for its long term well being. The Management committee aims to provide first class facilities at affordable cost to groups serving the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 May 1996: Standard registration
- TOWN HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jackson | Chair | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amy Robinson | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Watson | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Trueman | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|||||
JOHN WORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK STEWART ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FREDA MARY ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN NORTHRIDGE MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELLEN STORM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.20k | £39.75k | £23.77k | £17.54k | £39.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.54k | £32.03k | £24.94k | £27.31k | £47.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7TH SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 27, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THIRSK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thirsk and Sowerby Town Hall
Westgate
THIRSK
North Yorkshire
YO7 1QS
- Phone:
- 01845522650
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window