TOOLS FOR SELF RELIANCE CYMRU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-To relieve poverty amongst the people of the under-developed areas of the World by the provision of hand and other tools, equipment and training. -To educate the public in Wales concerning the nature, causes and effects of poverty, and the distress and suffering arising there from in the underdeveloped areas in the World, and the special problems arising from the lack of suitable hand tools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £18,495 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
- Tanzania
Governance
- 21 May 1996: Standard registration
- T F S R CYMRU (Working name)
- TOOLS FOR SELF RELIANCE (CYMRU) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corin Mills | Chair | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Dickson | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Henry Morris Wallace | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN THOMAS JONES | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR JEFF THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.82k | £86.00k | £125.08k | £92.81k | £131.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.87k | £78.13k | £85.53k | £129.30k | £128.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £19.27k | N/A | N/A | £18.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE PEOPLE OF THE UNDERDEVELOPED AREAS IN THE WORLD. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN WALES CONCERNING THE NATURE, CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF POVERTY AND THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING ARISING. 3. TO CARRY OUT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
T F S R Cymru
Upper House Farm
CRICKHOWELL
NP8 1BZ
- Phone:
- 03303550122
- Email:
- contact@tfsrcymru.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window